NJ SCR165 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Constitution to dedicate $200 million, or 2.4 percent, whichever is less, annually from FY2015 to FY2044 of sales and use tax revenue for preservation of open space, including flood prone areas and lands that protect water supplies, farmland, and historic properties.
Title
Amends Constitution to dedicate $200 million, or 2.4 percent, whichever is less, annually from FY2015 to FY2044 of sales and use tax revenue for preservation of open space, including flood prone areas and lands that protect water supplies, farmland, and historic properties.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Senate | Concurrent Resolution Placed on |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held SEN |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR160 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/SCR165 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/SCR/165_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR165 |