NJ SCR164 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Commissioner of Health to declare Alzheimer's disease public health crisis.
Title
Urges Commissioner of Health to declare Alzheimer's disease public health crisis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR228 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR228 |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR228 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by SCR164
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SCR164 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SCR/164_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR164 |