NJ SCR163 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Invalidates certain DEP rules and regulations concerning septic system density standards in Highlands Water Protection and Planning Act Rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Invalidates certain DEP rules and regulations concerning septic system density standards in Highlands Water Protection and Planning Act Rules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Acr255 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08AssemblyFiled with Secretary of State
2018-01-08AssemblyResolution Passed Assembly (42-25-0)
2018-01-08AssemblySubstituted for ACR255
2018-01-08AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-01-08SenatePassed by the Senate (22-16)
2017-11-30SenatePublic Hearing Placed on Desk Assembly
2017-11-30SenatePublic Hearing Placed on Desk Senate
2017-11-30SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-11-20SenatePublic Hearing Held SEN
2017-11-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

ACR255 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by SCR163

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback