NJ SCR156 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-10 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-10 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges U.S. Postal Service to issue postage stamp commemorating John Matthew Shippen, Jr.
Title
Urges U.S. Postal Service to issue postage stamp commemorating John Matthew Shippen, Jr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment (35-0) (Scutari) |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR221 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jasey)