NJ SCR154 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-20)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-20)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Condemns all forms of anti-Semitism and rejects attempts to justify anti-Jewish hatred.
Title
Condemns all forms of anti-Semitism and rejects attempts to justify anti-Jewish hatred.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Acr211 Ac (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For Acr211 Ac (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For Acr211 Ac (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR211 (1R) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR211 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - Substituted by SCR154 (1R)