NJ SCR150 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR92
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Governor to block proposed rules permitting import of wastewater from hydraulic fracturing into Delaware River Basin and export of water from basin for hydraulic fracturing; Urges Governor to ban hydraulic fracturing in basin.*
Title
Urges Governor to block proposed rules permitting import of wastewater from hydraulic fracturing into Delaware River Basin and export of water from basin for hydraulic fracturing; Urges Governor to ban hydraulic fracturing in basin.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-2) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR150 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
ACR208 (Same As) 2018-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
ACR208 (Same As) 2018-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee