NJ SCR134 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses Legislature's intent that school districts and public institutions of higher education continue to act as safe zones and protect identities and data related to undocumented students and families.
Title
Expresses Legislature's intent that school districts and public institutions of higher education continue to act as safe zones and protect identities and data related to undocumented students and families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Acr227 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Acr227 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (23-13) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (47-18-2) |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR227 |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Voice) (Oliver) |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-10) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR219 (Same As) 2016-12-12 - Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading
ACR227 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Substituted by SCR134 (2R)
ACR227 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Substituted by SCR134 (2R)