NJ SCR132 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends State Constitution to create joint legislative and executive branch New Jersey Revenue Certification Board to provide consensus certification of revenues for State budget purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends State Constitution to create joint legislative and executive branch New Jersey Revenue Certification Board to provide consensus certification of revenues for State budget purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2018-07-26SenatePassed by the Senate (28-3)
2018-07-23SenatePublic Hearing Held SBA
2018-06-30SenateConcurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
2018-06-29SenateConcurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate
2018-06-27SenateIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback