NJ SCR132 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Applies to Congress for limited constitutional convention to limit corrupting influence of money in politics and overturn Citizens United decision and related cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applies to Congress for limited constitutional convention to limit corrupting influence of money in politics and overturn Citizens United decision and related cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Acr149 Ac (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For Acr149 Ac (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24AssemblyFiled with Secretary of State
2015-02-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (44-25-2)
2015-02-23AssemblySubstituted for ACR149 (1R)
2015-01-12AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2014-12-18SenatePassed by the Senate (23-12)
2014-12-18SenateMotion To Table (22-11) (Weinberg)
2014-12-18SenateMotion To Sa (Pennacchio)
2014-10-16SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2014-08-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

ACR149 (Same As) 2015-02-23 - Substituted by SCR132

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback