NJ SCR124 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to repeal the moratorium on funding for firearm violence research.
Title
Memorializes Congress to repeal the moratorium on funding for firearm violence research.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Acr209 Ac (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (48-23-5) |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR209 (1R) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-15) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR209 (Same As) 2017-05-22 - Substituted by SCR124 (1R)