NJ SCR120 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR13
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to enact reforms addressing sexual harassment and assault in United States Armed Forces.
Title
Urges Congress to enact reforms addressing sexual harassment and assault in United States Armed Forces.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR55 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
ACR13 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
ACR13 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SCR120 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SCR/120_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR120 |