NJ SCR113 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a "Legislative Task Force on Public Broadcasting" to study Governor's proposal to transfer assets of NJ Public Broadcasting Authority to an independent, not-for-profit organization.
Title
Establishes a "Legislative Task Force on Public Broadcasting" to study Governor's proposal to transfer assets of NJ Public Broadcasting Authority to an independent, not-for-profit organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-06-28 | Passed by the Assembly (72-6-0) | |
2010-06-28 | Substituted for ACR138 | |
2010-06-28 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-28 | Passed by the Senate (40-0) | |
2010-06-24 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR138 (Same As) 2010-06-28 - Substituted by SCR113
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/SCR113 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/SCR/113_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR113 |