NJ SCR112 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR105
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR98
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR15
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR113
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR98
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR15
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Substituted by ACR142
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Substituted by ACR142
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reconstitutes "Joint Committee on Economic Justice and Equal Employment Opportunity."
Title
Reconstitutes "Joint Committee on Economic Justice and Equal Employment Opportunity."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-29 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | Senate | Substituted by ACR142 |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR112 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by ACR142
SCR112 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by ACR142
SCR15 (Carry Over) 2020-08-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
ACR113 (Carry Over) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by SCR15 (1R)
ACR142 (Same As) 2022-12-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
SCR112 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by ACR142
SCR15 (Carry Over) 2020-08-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
ACR113 (Carry Over) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by SCR15 (1R)
ACR142 (Same As) 2022-12-19 - Filed with Secretary of State