NJ SCR111 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to enact legislation enhancing safeguards prior to sale of firearms.
Title
Memorializes Congress to enact legislation enhancing safeguards prior to sale of firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Acr195 Ac (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (55-8-8) |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR195 (1R) |
2016-10-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-5) |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
ACR195 (Same As) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by SCR111
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/SCR111 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/SCR/111_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR111 |