NJ SCR110 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to enact legislation requiring transparency and promoting social equity in federal opportunity zones.
Title
Urges Congress to enact legislation requiring transparency and promoting social equity in federal opportunity zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR153 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR153 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (69-0-3) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR153 |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR153 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by SCR110