NJ SCR100 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR15
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR72
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR116
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR14
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR72
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR116
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR14
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes constitutional amendment to preserve right of people to fish, hunt, trap and harvest fish and wildlife.
Title
Proposes constitutional amendment to preserve right of people to fish, hunt, trap and harvest fish and wildlife.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR100 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
SCR100 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
ACR14 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
SCR116 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
ACR14 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
SCR100 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
ACR14 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
SCR116 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
ACR14 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SCR100 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SCR/100_I1.HTM |