NJ SCR1 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-14 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-14 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes constitutional amendment to authorize Legislature to permit by law establishment and operation of casinos in certain counties.
Title
Proposes constitutional amendment to authorize Legislature to permit by law establishment and operation of casinos in certain counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Acr1 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (54-17-3) |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR1 |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-6) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (SBA) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR1 (Same As) 2016-03-14 - Substituted by SCR1 (1R)