NJ S983 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S866
Note: Carry Foward to future A3294
Note: Carry Foward to future A3294
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends eligibility for certain individuals for emergency assistance.
Title
Extends eligibility for certain individuals for emergency assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2568 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-17-6) |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Substituted for A2568 (1R) |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S983 (Carry Over) 2016-05-02 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
S983 (Carry Over) 2016-05-02 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A2568 (Same As) 2016-03-14 - Substituted by S983 (1R)
S983 (Carry Over) 2016-05-02 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A2568 (Same As) 2016-03-14 - Substituted by S983 (1R)