NJ S904 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S913
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits conversion of fines for violation of certain municipal ordinances into tax liens.
Title
Permits conversion of fines for violation of certain municipal ordinances into tax liens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-2) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (33-1) (Connors) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment (32-0) (Connors) |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S913 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A973 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A973 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee