NJ S877 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3560

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes and modifies clean energy and energy efficiency programs; establishes zero emission certificate program; modifies State's solar renewable portfolio standards. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes and modifies clean energy and energy efficiency programs; establishes zero emission certificate program; modifies State's solar renewable portfolio standards. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3560 (Carry Over) 2017-12-20 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2850 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback