NJ S874 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits cancellation of municipal charges and fees under $10.
Title
Permits cancellation of municipal charges and fees under $10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-22 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | |
2010-03-04 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2944 (Same As) 2010-06-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S874 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S1000/874_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S874 |