NJ S862 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A3904
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A3904
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Tommy's Law"; requires NJT to take certain action and adopt policies concerning person injured or killed in incidents involving NJT motorbuses and rail or light rail vehicles.*
Title
"Tommy's Law"; requires NJT to take certain action and adopt policies concerning person injured or killed in incidents involving NJT motorbuses and rail or light rail vehicles.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A3904 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3904 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.113.