NJ S853 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-23 - Substituted by A1649 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires local governments and authorities to obtain financing cost estimate from NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust for certain projects.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires local governments and authorities to obtain financing cost estimate from NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust for certain projects.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-15 - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-23SenateSubstituted by A1649 (2R)
2016-12-15SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-11-03SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-11-03SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2354 (Carry Over) 2014-10-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
a1649 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-4-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback