NJ S841 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S940

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires direct payment of homestead credit to claimant following sale of qualifying homestead and upon claimant request.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires direct payment of homestead credit to claimant following sale of qualifying homestead and upon claimant request.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2020-09-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S940 (Carry Over) 2018-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3070 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback