NJ S811 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1202
Note: Carry Over of previous S3074
Note: Carry Over of previous S3074
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands rights of crime victims.
Title
Expands rights of crime victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (34-0) (Weinberg) |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-0) (Weinberg) |
2016-09-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S811 (Carry Over) 2016-11-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3074 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1423 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3074 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1423 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee