NJ S805 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2786
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain laws concerning domestic violence and firearms.
Title
Revises certain laws concerning domestic violence and firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1211 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (50-17-7) |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Substituted for A1211 |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-3) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2786 (Carry Over) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A4218 (2R)
A1211 (Same As) 2016-04-07 - Substituted by S805
A1211 (Same As) 2016-04-07 - Substituted by S805
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S805 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S1000/805_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S805 |