NJ S783 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S817
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-11 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-11 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Unfair Wage Recovery Act"; provides that unlawful employment practice occurs each time individual is affected.
Title
"Unfair Wage Recovery Act"; provides that unlawful employment practice occurs each time individual is affected.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2349 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2349 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2349 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-26-3) |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A2349 (ACS) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-13) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S783 (Carry Over) 2014-08-11 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A2349 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S783
A2349 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S783
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/S783 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/S1000/783_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S783 |