NJ S770 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S798
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (24-13) (Turner)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (24-13) (Turner)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures and standards regarding public service privatization contracts.
Title
Establishes procedures and standards regarding public service privatization contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Veto Override (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Veto Override (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2873 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2873 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Veto Override (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2873 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2873 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Senate | Lost in the Senate AVOR (24-13) (Turner) |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (48-30-0) |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A2873 (1R) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-14) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S770 (Carry Over) 2014-12-18 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (24-13) (Turner)
A2873 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S770 (1R)
A2873 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S770 (1R)