NJ S762 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Treasurer to issue cost benefit analysis and security report for conversion of military housing to civilian housing at Earle Naval Weapons Station and places moratorium on issuance of certain State permits and plan approvals.
Title
Requires State Treasurer to issue cost benefit analysis and security report for conversion of military housing to civilian housing at Earle Naval Weapons Station and places moratorium on issuance of certain State permits and plan approvals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Passed by the Senate (37-0) | |
2010-03-04 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-02-18 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2014 (Same As) 2010-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S762 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S1000/762_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S762 |