NJ S745 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2391
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits county clerk or register of deeds and mortgages to create Gold Star Parent identification card.
Title
Permits county clerk or register of deeds and mortgages to create Gold Star Parent identification card.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A458 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A458 |
2017-12-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2391 (Carry Over) 2014-12-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A458 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S745
A458 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S745
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S745 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S1000/745_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S745 |