NJ S742 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - Substituted by A1543 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - Substituted by A1543 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Revised Uniform Limited Liability Company Act."
Title
"Revised Uniform Limited Liability Company Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | Substituted by A1543 (1R) |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Sarlo) |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1543 (Same As) 2012-09-19 - Approved P.L.2012, c.50.