NJ S735 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A970
Note: Carry Foward to future S1750
Note: Carry Over of previous S2193
Note: Carry Over of previous A1409
Note: Carry Foward to future S1750
Note: Carry Over of previous S2193
Note: Carry Over of previous A1409
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows gross income tax deduction for functional improvements and home repairs made to taxpayer's primary residence.
Title
Allows gross income tax deduction for functional improvements and home repairs made to taxpayer's primary residence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S735 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S735 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2193 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2416 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A1409 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S735 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2193 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2416 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A1409 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S735 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/735_I1.HTM |