NJ S733 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4288
Note: Carry Over of previous A6227
Note: Carry Over of previous S3735
Note: Carry Over of previous A6227
Note: Carry Over of previous S3735
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for transfers from General Fund to UI trust fund, reduces employer contributions to UI trust fund, assesses contributions from employers to repay transferred amounts, and provides tax credits to small businesses to offset UI tax increases.
Title
Provides for transfers from General Fund to UI trust fund, reduces employer contributions to UI trust fund, assesses contributions from employers to repay transferred amounts, and provides tax credits to small businesses to offset UI tax increases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4288 (Carry Over) 2021-12-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A6227 (Carry Over) 2021-12-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A2152 (Same As) 2022-05-19 - Combined with A3683 (ACS)
A3683 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3735 (Carry Over) 2021-05-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A6227 (Carry Over) 2021-12-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A2152 (Same As) 2022-05-19 - Combined with A3683 (ACS)
A3683 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3735 (Carry Over) 2021-05-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee