NJ S726 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1749
Note: Carry Over of previous S568
Note: Carry Over of previous A714
Note: Carry Over of previous S3625
Note: Carry Over of previous S568
Note: Carry Over of previous A714
Note: Carry Over of previous S3625
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notification of local law enforcement prior to expungement of certain mental health records of prospective firearms purchasers.
Title
Requires notification of local law enforcement prior to expungement of certain mental health records of prospective firearms purchasers.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S726 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S568 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A714 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3625 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S568 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A714 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3625 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S726 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/726_I2.HTM |