NJ S719 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S634
Note: Carry Foward to future A2427
Note: Carry Over of previous S2651
Note: Carry Foward to future A2427
Note: Carry Over of previous S2651
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Senate Amendment (34-0) (Greenstein)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Senate Amendment (34-0) (Greenstein)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
" Reliability, Preparedness, and Storm Response Act; requires public utilities to file certain information concerning emergency preparedness with BPU and increases certain penalties.**
Title
" Reliability, Preparedness, and Storm Response Act; requires public utilities to file certain information concerning emergency preparedness with BPU and increases certain penalties.**
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Joseph Pennacchio [R] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. James Holzapfel [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-0) (Greenstein) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S719 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Senate Amendment (34-0) (Greenstein)
S719 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Senate Amendment (34-0) (Greenstein)
S2651 (Carry Over) 2016-10-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A2426 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Senate Amendment (32-0) (Greenstein)
S719 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Senate Amendment (34-0) (Greenstein)
S2651 (Carry Over) 2016-10-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A2426 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Senate Amendment (32-0) (Greenstein)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S719 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S1000/719_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S719 |