NJ S709 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3455

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A2035 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises "New Jersey Residential Mortgage Lending Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises "New Jersey Residential Mortgage Lending Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted by A2035 (1R)
2018-06-21SenateSenate Amendment (36-0) (Pou)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-18SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3455 (Carry Over) 2017-11-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2035 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback