NJ S692 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3645

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires school districts to provide feminine hygiene products in certain public schools and requires State to pay costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school districts to provide feminine hygiene products in certain public schools and requires State to pay costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-02-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3645 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3388 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback