NJ S691 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1040
Note: Carry Over of previous S503
Note: Carry Over of previous S503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that if a school district satisfies 80% or more of the required NJ Quality Single Accountability Continuum standards in an area of district effectiveness under State intervention, the State must return that area to local control.
Title
Requires that if a school district satisfies 80% or more of the required NJ Quality Single Accountability Continuum standards in an area of district effectiveness under State intervention, the State must return that area to local control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A657 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A657 |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S691 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S503 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A657 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S691
S503 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A657 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S691
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S691 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S1000/691_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S691 |