NJ S690 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S614
Note: Carry Over of previous S316
Note: Carry Over of previous S316
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases flexibility, clarity, and available tools of optional municipal consolidation process.
Title
Increases flexibility, clarity, and available tools of optional municipal consolidation process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2921 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-21-2) |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A2921 (1R) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (25-13) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S690 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
S316 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A2921 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S690 (1R)
S316 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A2921 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S690 (1R)