NJ S690 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Vetoed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (23-15) (Buono)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (23-15) (Buono)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Garden State Film and Digital Media Jobs Act"; expands existing film and digital media production tax credit programs.
Title
"Garden State Film and Digital Media Jobs Act"; expands existing film and digital media production tax credit programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Veto Override (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Lost in the Senate AVOR (23-15) (Buono) | |
2011-02-22 | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate | |
2011-01-10 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (48-17-12) | |
2011-01-10 | Substituted for A2905 (2R) | |
2011-01-10 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-10 | Passed by the Senate (35-2) | |
2010-12-20 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-06 | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2905 (Same As) 2011-01-10 - Substituted by S690 (1R)