NJ S671 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S563
Note: Carry Foward to future A2997
Note: Carry Over of previous S240
Note: Carry Over of previous A2679
Note: Carry Foward to future A2997
Note: Carry Over of previous S240
Note: Carry Over of previous A2679
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes from gross income tax value of prizes or awards won in athletic competition in Olympic Games.
Title
Excludes from gross income tax value of prizes or awards won in athletic competition in Olympic Games.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S671 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S671 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S240 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4109 (Same As) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2679 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S671 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S240 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4109 (Same As) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2679 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S671 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/671_I1.HTM |