NJ S656 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2771
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-04 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-04 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Thomas Alva Edison as State Inventor.
Title
Designates Thomas Alva Edison as State Inventor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2771 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A562 (Same As) 2017-12-04 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A562 (Same As) 2017-12-04 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading