NJ S648 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1857
Note: Carry Foward to future A4155
Note: Carry Over of previous S426
Note: Carry Over of previous A3179
Note: Carry Foward to future A4155
Note: Carry Over of previous S426
Note: Carry Over of previous A3179
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises definition of "landlord" to include rooming and boarding house owners and operators with regard to ordinances holding landlords to certain standards of responsibility.
Title
Revises definition of "landlord" to include rooming and boarding house owners and operators with regard to ordinances holding landlords to certain standards of responsibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
2022-11-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S648 (Carry Over) 2022-11-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S648 (Carry Over) 2022-11-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S426 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3179 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A4450 (Same As) 2022-09-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S648 (Carry Over) 2022-11-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S426 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3179 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A4450 (Same As) 2022-09-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee