NJ S64 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3868
Note: Legislation replaced by A3088
Note: Legislation replaced by A3088
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A3088 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A3088 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases earned income tax credit; provides credit for child or dependent care expenses; taxes "investment management services." *
Title
Increases earned income tax credit; provides credit for child or dependent care expenses; taxes "investment management services." *
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Joseph Pennacchio [R] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | Substituted by A3088 (ACS) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3868 (Carry Over) 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3992 (Same As) 2018-05-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A3088 (Replaced by) 2018-07-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.45.
A3992 (Same As) 2018-05-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A3088 (Replaced by) 2018-07-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.45.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S64 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S0500/64_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S64 |