NJ S63 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises "Pet Purchase Protection Act" to establish new requirements for pet dealers and pet shops.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises "Pet Purchase Protection Act" to establish new requirements for pet dealers and pet shops.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2017-01-30AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-11-14AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-11-14AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
2016-06-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2016-06-30SenatePassed by the Senate (27-8)
2016-06-30SenateEmergency Resolution (32-3) (Lesniak)
2016-06-30SenateSenate Amendment (29-0) (Lesniak)
2016-06-27SenateSenate Amendment (27-0) (Lesniak)
2016-06-23SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2016-03-07SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-03-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2338 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S3041
S3041 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (52-16-3)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback