NJ S618 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1353
Note: Carry Foward to future S2100
Note: Carry Over of previous S3644
Note: Carry Over of previous A1886
Note: Carry Foward to future S2100
Note: Carry Over of previous S3644
Note: Carry Over of previous A1886
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Volunteer Emergency Responder Loan Redemption Program in Higher Education Student Assistance Authority.
Title
Establishes Volunteer Emergency Responder Loan Redemption Program in Higher Education Student Assistance Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S618 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S618 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S3644 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1886 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A3375 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S618 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S3644 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1886 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A3375 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S618 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/618_I1.HTM |