NJ S608 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits licensed dealers to display and auction firearms at fund raising events sponsored by certain tax exempt organizations.
Title
Permits licensed dealers to display and auction firearms at fund raising events sponsored by certain tax exempt organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Norcross [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Kevin O'Toole [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2012-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1530 (Same As) 2012-01-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S608 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S1000/608_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S608 |