NJ S591 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S484
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-14 - Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-14 - Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education to provide to prospective students certain cost, loan, and debt information in financial aid shopping sheet.
Title
Requires institutions of higher education to provide to prospective students certain cost, loan, and debt information in financial aid shopping sheet.
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S484 (Carry Over) 2014-05-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A3302 (Same As) 2017-12-14 - Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3302 (Same As) 2017-12-14 - Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee