NJ S590 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Enrolled on December 5 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-05 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 5 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-05 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public institutions of higher education and Department of Military and Veterans Affairs' to include link on their websites for access to educational information. *
Title
Requires public institutions of higher education and Department of Military and Veterans Affairs' to include link on their websites for access to educational information. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-05 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) | |
2011-12-05 | Substituted for A1677 (ACS) | |
2010-06-10 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Passed by the Senate (36-0) | |
2010-02-01 | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2302 (Same As) 2010-03-04 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S590 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S1000/590_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S590 |