NJ S587 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3200
Note: Carry Over of previous A5022
Note: Carry Over of previous A5022
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Substituted by A649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Substituted by A649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands purposes for which civil asset forfeiture funds may be used by law enforcement agency.
Title
Expands purposes for which civil asset forfeiture funds may be used by law enforcement agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Senate | Substituted by A649 |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3200 (Carry Over) 2020-11-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5022 (Carry Over) 2020-11-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A649 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.228.
A5022 (Carry Over) 2020-11-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A649 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.228.